Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0474 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024
Analysis December 14, 2023
Analysis December 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 17, 2024