Senate
|
07/10/2024
|
Veto Message referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2024
|
Veto Message received
|
|
|
|
06/21/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (582213)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment 582213 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/24/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
CS/CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
CS/CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS by Education Postsecondary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
CS by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/28/2023
|
Referred to Education Postsecondary; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|