Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0494 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 16, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024