Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 11/17/2023 | Filed |