Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0512 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024