Senate | 02/08/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 83 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Substituted HB 83 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/24 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 01/24/24, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Referred to Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 11/17/2023 | Filed |