Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0520 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024