Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in returning Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Insisted on amendment, and requested the Senate to concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Insisted on amendment 126347
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Requested House to recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Refused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (126347)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment 126347 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (501280, 741254, 749944, 960044)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/13/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|