Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0536 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 18, 2024