Senate | 02/01/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to HM 351 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Substituted HM 351 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/24 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/24/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/09/24, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/20/2023 | Filed |