Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0540 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024