Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Now in Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/20/2023 | Filed |