Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0542 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024