|
04/29/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-111
|
|
|
|
04/26/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/26/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/30/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/09/24, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|