Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0548 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024