Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 01/24/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Filed |