Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0550 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 18, 2024