Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 591
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 591
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|