Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0554 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024