|
05/29/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-200
|
|
|
|
05/28/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/21/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 104, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment 249405 Recede
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Requested House to recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Refused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (249405)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 249405 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/30/24, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|