Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0556 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 27, 2024
Bill January 18, 2024