Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 321
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 321
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|