Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0602 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024