Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/13/24, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Filed |