Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0618 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 29, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024