Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 87
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 87
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 13 NAYS 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/07/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 6 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/24/24, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/29/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|