Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0632 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 29, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2024
Bill January 26, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024