Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/24/24, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 11/30/2023 | Filed |