Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0650 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024