Senate | 02/21/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 273 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Substituted CS/CS/HB 273 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/10/24, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/01/2023 | Filed |