Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0660 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024