06/27/2024 | Chapter No. 2024-267 | |||
06/26/2024 | Approved by Governor | |||
06/17/2024 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Passed; YEAS 103, NAYS 9 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/31/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 12/04/2023 | Filed |