Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0674 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024