Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 523
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Substituted HB 523
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/31/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 01/17/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|