Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0694 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024