06/17/2024 | Chapter No. 2024-232 | |||
06/13/2024 | Approved by Governor | |||
05/30/2024 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/24 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/24/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Referred to Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Filed |