Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0702 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024