Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Filed |