Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0708 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024