Senate | 03/04/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 103 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Substituted CS/HB 103 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Retained on Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/15/24 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | CS by Rules read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | CS by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/30/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 12/15/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Filed |