Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0712 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024