Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|