Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0716 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 12, 2024
Bill January 23, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024