House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 29 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (832146)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/21/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|