Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0720 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 6, 2024