Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1653
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 1653
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in Health Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/16/24, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Health Policy; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|