Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0768 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024