Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 179
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 179
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/21/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|