Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0774 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill February 8, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024