Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 7063
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted HB 7063
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|